Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Hutchinson, Erik, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Elwell, Matthew Alan, Mcmullen, Anna, against Bulhon, Courtney, Greenup, Courtney, represented by Cano, Brian G, Cano, Brian Gregory, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 234th with LAUREN REEDER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLAUREN REEDER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House234th |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Non-Suit Signed |
DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: May 12, 2020Defendant's Original Answer
Date: May 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2021 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting PER MEDIATOR REPORT F-6/30 |
||
August 16, 2021 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (MOTION TO) (TRCP 165A) Trial Coordinators Docket |
||
August 02, 2021 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
August 02, 2021 | ORDER OF NONSUIT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Motion for Nonsuit with Prejudice | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order of Nonsuit | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - NO FINAL ORDER-JCVF4S | |
June 30, 2021 | HOLD FOR JUDGMENT | ||
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Mediation Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.