Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Smyrna Ready Mix Llc Dba Srm Concrete, Srm Concrete, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Walker, William Jason, against Adarsh Lodging Llc, Chinese Community Center Inc C O Chi-Mei Lin, Derichebourg Recycling Usa Inc, Miranda, Juan J, Slab Strategies Llc C O Registered Agent Darius Hearn, (total of 6) See All represented by Huvard, Mark A, Huvard, Mark Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 151st with MIKE ENGELHART presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMIKE ENGELHART Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2019 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House151st |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment Signed |
Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: October 31, 2019ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED
Date: January 06, 2020Letter to the Court with Exhibit attached
Date: December 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting DISPOSED (FINAL) |
||
January 08, 2021 |
DOCKET CALL Trial Coordinators Docket |
||
March 18, 2020 | DEFENDANT COSTS | ||
March 18, 2020 | DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
March 18, 2020 | ORDER SIGNED AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES (Temporary Order) | ||
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED | |
March 16, 2020 |
DEFAULT - MOTION FOR (TRCP 239) Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) OS 3/18 |
||
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Motion for Final Default Judgment | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Exhibit A | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Exhibit B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.