Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by Office Of Attorney General, 615, against Johnson, Laronica Rosha, Marshall, Matthew, Marshall, Matthew Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 310th with SONYA L. HEATH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSONYA L. HEATH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2019 |
CategoryIv-D Oag Only-Paternity |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House310th |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment Signed For Non-Adversary (Non-Jury) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Family Trial Docket |
||
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | COUNTER-PETITIONER'S SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | COUNTER-PETITION TO MODIFY PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS | |
May 14, 2021 |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE (NO TCR) Pre-Trial Conference (Family) |
||
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER and NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS | |
March 22, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Family Trial Docket |
||
March 22, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Family Trial Docket |
||
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order on Motion for Continuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.