Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ridgway, Christopher R, Ridgway, Samantha A, R, K R, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lassiter, James Morris Iii, against Aldrete, Jose O, Gutierrez, Miguel A, Medina-Tamayo, Yoel A, represented by Howard, Gregory M, Schenk, Erich L., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 011th with KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 22, 2018 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House011th |
Filing Letter
Date: December 04, 2018Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant
Date: August 22, 2018Plaintiff's interrogatories to defendant
Date: August 22, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | TRIAL.PREPARATION.ORDER | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RESETTING TRIAL | |
May 22, 2020 | ORDER TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM GRANTED (Temporary Order) | ||
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM GRANTED | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Return Notice of Activity | |
April 27, 2020 | ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED | |
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order for Partial Nonsuit with Prejudice | |
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Partial Nonsuit with Prejudice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.