Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Davis, Darrelle, Maus, Emily, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by O'Hara, Patrick J., O'Hara, Patrick Jonathan, against Pickney, Elizabeth, Pickney, Freeman, represented by Drews, Karl Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 281st with CHRISTINE WEEMS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHRISTINE WEEMS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Inj (Non-Auto) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House281st |
Proposed Order for Confidentiality and Protective Order
Date: October 15, 2018Motion for Confidentiality and Protective Order
Date: October 15, 2018Civil Process Request Form
Date: July 30, 2018Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: July 30, 2018Defendant Elizabeth Pickney's Original Answer
Date: September 10, 2018Proposed order
Date: November 01, 2018Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Confidentiality and Protective Order
Date: November 01, 2018Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition
Date: November 20, 2018Proposed Order
Date: January 31, 2019Defendant Elizabeth Pickney's First Amended Answer
Date: December 17, 2018Defendant's Motion for Severance
Date: January 31, 2019Proposed Order_Response to Defendant's Motion to Sever
Date: February 14, 2019Plaintiff's Third Amended Petition
Date: May 02, 2019Defendant Elizabeth Pickney' No Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 23, 2020Proposed Order Granting Motion for Severance
Date: December 08, 2020Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Petition
Date: January 07, 2021DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: October 25, 2018ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 10, 2021Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's No Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 11, 2021Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion to Sever
Date: February 14, 2019Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Petition
Date: June 06, 2019SEVERANCE ORDER SIGNED, PARTY REMOVED
Date: December 28, 2020Proposed Order Denying Defendant's No Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 11, 2021Plaintiff's First Amended Petition
Date: October 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2021 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Reporter's Certification Deposition of Emily Maus March 17 2021 | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | TRIAL SETTING | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Intention To Take Deposition By Written Questions | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
March 10, 2021 | ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Temporary Order) | ||
January 18, 2021 |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT-FINAL (MOTION FOR) (TRCP 166A) Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) O/S 03.10.2021 |
||
January 18, 2021 |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT - MOTION FOR FINAL (TRCP 166A) Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) |
||
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's No Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Denying Defendant's No Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.