Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hernandez, Erik, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carreon, Abraham, against Leffingwell, Valerie, represented by Osborn, Shane, Osborn, William Shane, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 189th with SCOT DOLLINGER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCOT DOLLINGER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2018 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House189th |
ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: April 17, 2019Plaintiff's first request for production and interrogatories to defendant
Date: March 04, 2018ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: April 11, 2019ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: August 21, 2019Civil Process Request Form
Date: March 04, 2018DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: May 16, 2018Agreed Motion for Continuance
Date: April 09, 2019Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witnesses
Date: January 14, 2019Defendant's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 12, 2018ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: May 20, 2020ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: January 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RESETTING TRIAL | |
April 27, 2020 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RESETTING TRIAL | |
December 09, 2019 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
October 25, 2019 | FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Defendants First Amend Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER RESETTING TRIAL | |
July 22, 2019 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Change in Designation of Lead Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.