Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Rolls, William, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Buzbee, Anthony Glenn, against Elite Industrial Services Inc, Elite Specialty Welding Llc, Packaging Corporation Of America Inc, represented by Cano, Brian G, Cano, Brian Gregory, Oubre, David A, Oubre, David A., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 190th with BEAU MILLER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBEAU MILLER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Inj (Non-Auto) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House190th |
Plaintiff's Original Petition and Rule 194 Reqeuest for Disclosure
Date: January 08, 2018DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: March 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2021 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
July 30, 2021 |
DOCKET CALL (MOTION FOR) Trial Coordinators Docket CASE SETTLED |
||
July 23, 2021 | HOLD FOR JUDGMENT | ||
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | SETTING REMINDER | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DCA Generic Letter | |
January 31, 2021 | ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL(Temporary Order) | ||
January 31, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL | |
January 18, 2021 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
January 18, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
July 20, 2020 | ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL(Temporary Order) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.