Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The County Of Guadalupe, Texas, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Matthew Tepper, against Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Publisher's Affidavit
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale issued
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Order - 306a Sent
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certified Tax Affidavit
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Old III, William D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.