Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The County Of Guadalupe, Texas, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Matthew Tepper, against Leilanii Investments, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Leilanii Investments, LLC Served 12/16/2021 Returned 12/22/2021 Surface Works, Inc. Served 10/05/2021 Returned 10/06/2021
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Old III, William D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.