Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryAdministrative Appeal |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Nonsuit
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Guadalupe Appraisal District Served 09/07/2021 Returned 09/07/2021
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Wright, Heather |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.