Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cabrera, Christina, Carter, Misty, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Mysiha Lacey-Tilson, against Clary, Billy, Midtex Oil, L.P. Dba Midtex Oil, Inc., represented by Mark E. Macias, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) | |
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Agreed Resolution CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) Agreed Resolution |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Announcement Per Judge CANCELED Announcement (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) Per Judge |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Reporter's Record | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Reporter's Record |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.