Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wagley, Clifton, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by James D Baskin, against Leinneweber Concrete Construction, Llc, Thomas, Harold Dwight, represented by Joanna R. Lippman, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryDamages - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Nonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Agreed Resolution CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) Agreed Resolution |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Announcement (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Deposition | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Intention | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.