Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Herrera, Julia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Infante, Jerry, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Other CANCELED Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) Other |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Motion | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Set on the Non-Jury Docket | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Served | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation INFANTE, JERRY Served 05/06/2021 Returned 05/11/2021 | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indigency |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.