Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case represented by Shawn R. Redman, Timothy L. Elder, against Stewart, Susan E, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2021 |
CategoryAccounts, Contracts & Notes |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Postcard
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Order - 306a Sent
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Designation
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation STEWART, SUSAN E Unserved
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Process
Judge: Wright, Heather |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.