Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Guadalupe County Attorney (Felony Jurisdiction) filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Ochoa-Garcia, Luis Lauro, represented by Bernard Campion, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Jessica Richard Crawford presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJessica Richard Crawford Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 03, 2021 |
CategoryWrit Of Habeas Corpus - Bond Reduction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing for Want of Prosecution (OCA)
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Crawford, Jessica)
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Docket
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt of Exhibits
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Crawford, Jessica)
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Fiat
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Unsigned Order
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order to be Signed by Judge | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application Filed (OCA)
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.