Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Wright, Heather presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWright, Heather Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 30, 2021 |
CategoryNotice Of Seizure And Intended Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Nonsuit
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment (OCA)
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Servicemembers Civil Relief Act Affidavit
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued
Judge: Wright, Heather |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.