Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bagwell-Lange, Anastacia N, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bagwell-Lange, Jessika E, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Old III, William D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOld III, William D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 28, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing-Agreed Divorce Case Disposed CANCELED Hearing-Agreed Divorce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Old III, William D) Case Disposed Judge: Old III, William D |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Prove Up
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Prove Up
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Old III, William D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.