Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Monaco, Adam Lowell, filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case represented by Jake S. Rogiers, against Denham, Alfred Tilden, Hochheim Prairie Farm Mutual Insurance Assocation, represented by J. Dean Jackson, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2021 |
CategoryAccounts, Contracts & Notes |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Agreed Resolution CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) Agreed Resolution Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Announcement Agreed Resolution CANCELED Announcement (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) Agreed Resolution Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Order - 306a Sent
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Nonsuit
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Unsigned Order
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Hochheim Prairie Farm Mutual Insurance Assocation Served 04/29/2021 Returned 05/03/2021
Judge: Wright, Heather |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.