Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bolanos, Maria Alma, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bolanos-Ramirez, Ruben, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order to be Signed by Judge | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing-Temporary Orders (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Old III, William D) | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | No Fee Document | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Filing | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Vacation Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.