Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barrett, Calvin Todd, filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case represented by William P. Germany, against Kemper Independence Insurance Company, represented by Michael C Upshaw, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2021 |
CategoryAccounts, Contracts & Notes |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Agreed Resolution CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) Agreed Resolution Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Announcement Agreed Resolution CANCELED Announcement (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) Agreed Resolution Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Served
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service
Judge: Wright, Heather |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.