Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Butters, Andrew Lytle, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Joe A. Gamez, against Hale, John Timothy, Mears Installation, Llc, represented by Richard Espey, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2021 |
CategoryDamages - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Case Disposed CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) Case Disposed Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Announcement Case Disposed CANCELED Announcement (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) Case Disposed Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Agreed Resolution CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) Agreed Resolution Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Announcement Other CANCELED Announcement (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) Other Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Delivery
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Wright, Heather |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.