Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2021 |
CategoryDefamation |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Order - 306a Sent
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Vacation Letter
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Counter Claim
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Wright, Heather |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Wright, Heather |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.