Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Schemmel, John J., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Schemmel, Susan, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing-Temporary Orders (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Old III, William D) | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Counter Claim | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Response | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Precept Issued | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Issued | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Precept Schemmel, Susan Unserved | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Schemmel, Susan Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.