Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Vancura, David Perry, represented by Cathy Compton, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Old III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOld III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryWrit Of Habeas Corpus - Bond Reduction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bond
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application Filed (OCA)
Judge: Old III, William D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.