Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Guadalupe County Attorney'S Office filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Baker, Shane Ray, represented by James M. Yanney, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Crawford, Jessica presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCrawford, Jessica Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryWrit Of Habeas Corpus - Bond Reduction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Capias
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bond
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.