Case Last Refreshed: 20 hours ago
Rothrock, Shelby, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rothrock, James, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts 2nd 25th District Court with Jessica Richard Crawford presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJessica Richard Crawford Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House2nd 25th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Crawford, Jessica) | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Announcement (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Crawford, Jessica) | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Exhibit | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order on Discovery Period Order Order on Discovery Period |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Crawford, Jessica) motion to sign motion to sign |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Crawford, Jessica) | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Sign Order on Discovery Period Motion Motion to Sign Order on Discovery Period |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Setting | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order to be Signed by Judge Order on Discovery Period Order on Discovery Period |
|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.