Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
First Mercury Insurance Company, filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case represented by Ian A. Mccarthy, against Rohach Construction, Llc D B A G & N Roofing A K A G & N Industries, represented by Matthew J. Badders, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2020 |
CategoryAccounts, Contracts & Notes |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Old III, William D) | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Old III, William D) | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Response | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Unsigned Order | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.