Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The County Of Guadalupe, Texas, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Matthew Tepper, against Holman, Donald Lee, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2020 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Holman, Donald Lee Served 12/07/2020 Returned 12/11/2020 Holman, Donald C. Served 12/16/2020 Returned 12/21/2020 Holman, Sue B. Served 12/16/2020 Returned 12/21/2020
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Old III, William D |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Old III, William D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.