Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Department Of Family And Protective Services, filed a(n) State Participation case represented by Brittany M Mears, against Unknown Father, Moore, Calvin W, Iii, Moore, Bow John, represented by Molly Gayle Riley, Daryl R. Atkinson, Lana Choy, Myla G. Mayberry, Emily Jones Dunn, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWomack, Tim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2023 |
CategoryState Participation |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
14 Day - Cps Hearing (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Womack, Tim)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Return Investigator
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation WHITE, CHERINE ANGELA Served 01/27/2023 MOORE, CALVIN W, III Unserved MOORE, BOW JOHN Unserved SMITH, ANDRE Served 01/27/2023 Response Due 02/20/2023 Returned 01/27/2023
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice WHITE, CHERINE ANGELA Served 01/27/2023 MOORE, CALVIN W, III Unserved MOORE, BOW JOHN Unserved SMITH, ANDRE Served 01/27/2023 Returned 01/27/2023
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Return Investigator
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Hearing
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection of Children in an Emergency
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request Issue Instructions
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition (OCA)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.