Case Last Refreshed: 4 hours ago
Hanks, Paquita Michel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Jim Robbins, against Hanks, Eulas Charles, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts 307th District Court with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWomack, Tim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce W/ Pcr |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House307th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Report To Austin
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Report to Austin
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition (OCA)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.