Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Moore, Felicia Walker, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Moore, Shannon Mondrell, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWomack, Tim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce W/ Pcr |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (OCA)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Womack, Tim)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Docket
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Record of Support
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Report to Austin
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition (OCA)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation MOORE, SHANNON MONDRELL Unserved
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.