Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Preston, Chelsey, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case represented by Melba S Baxter, against Preston, Joshua Dylan, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWomack, Tim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2019 |
CategoryModification |
Last RefreshedMay 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Citation Preston, Joshua Dylan Unserved
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Post Judgment - Enforcement (OCA)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Preston, Joshua Dylan Unserved
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Local Rules Letter
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Divorce (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Womack, Tim)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Email
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice And Order
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Divorce CDC/OCA COURT CANCELED CANCELED Final Divorce (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Womack, Tim) CDC/OCA COURT CANCELED Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.