Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rumfield, Randal D., filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Murray, Leah E, in the jurisdiction of Gregg County, TX, . Gregg County, TX Superior Courts with Womack, Tim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWomack, Tim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 06, 2014 |
CategoryModification |
Last RefreshedJanuary 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGregg County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Post Judgment - Custody Modification (OCA)
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion To Pay Attorney Fees
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing (1:15 PM) ()
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Womack, Tim |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Womack, Tim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.