Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lamarque Public Improvement District 1 Phase 2, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Jason L. Bailey, against Patterson, William James, Pnc Bank, National Association, represented by Diana G Bertini, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 18, 2022 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA
Date: November 21, 2022Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: December 27, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: October 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
22TX0357-Whit Cert-Unx-PNC Bank Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena Return of Service-Unexecuted-PNC Bank Return of Service-Unexecuted-PNC Bank |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
22TX0357-NTC N.S-LM PID 1 PHSE 2 Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA Notice of Non-Suit-Final Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA Notice of Non-Suit-Final |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Receipt Acknowledge $531.00 | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate from Secretary of State | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ans-General Denial-PATTERSON Original Answer Answer/Response Answer/Response |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return of Service -Executed-PNC Bank Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena Return of Service -Executed-PNC Bank |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation and Return | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Tax Docket Control Order (Judicial Officer: McQuage, Thomas ) | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge of e citation of e citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.