Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Galveston County District Attorney, against Hernandez, Jesse, Lilliman, Gale Dba Gulf Coast Bail Bonds, represented by Kevin Rekoff, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 01, 2022 |
CategoryCriminal Matters - Bond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Cost Bill - Work Product
Date: December 22, 2022Remit Letter for Costs - File Copy
Date: December 22, 2022Agreed Judgment - Final - Bond Forfeiture
Date: December 16, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: December 09, 2022Original Answer
Date: August 12, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: August 03, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: August 03, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: August 03, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: August 02, 2022Status Conference Sheet
Date: August 02, 2022Judgment Nisi Declaring Forfeiture - OCA
Date: August 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) Case Disposed |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cost Bill - Work Product Sent to Sheriff's office by D.M Sent to Sheriff's office by D.M |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remit Letter for Costs - File Copy For Court Costs For Court Costs |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - Bond Forfeiture (Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jared ) Sent to BK & Civil DA 12/21/22 sbo Sent to BK & Civil DA 12/21/22 sbo |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment of Bond Forfeiture Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed Final Judgment of Bond Forfeiture |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Re: Delivery of notice of judgment nisi Re: Delivery of notice of judgment nisi |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Copy of Notice Emailed 1 notice of judgment nisi to surety Emailed 1 notice of judgment nisi to surety |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Copy of Notice Mailed by 1 st class mail 1 notice of judgment nisi to principal Mailed by 1 st class mail 1 notice of judgment nisi to principal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.