Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Southwestern Bell Telephone Company, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Ray L. Vela, against Mar-Con Services, Llc, represented by Clint W. Chase, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Jones, Jeth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJones, Jeth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2022 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 20, 2023Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA
Date: January 20, 2023Designation of Attorney of Record
Date: January 06, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: January 04, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: December 30, 2022Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: December 27, 2022Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: December 19, 2022Original Answer
Date: December 23, 2022Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: December 14, 2022Order for Substituted Service
Date: October 21, 2022Correspondence from Court
Date: October 24, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 20, 2022Motion for Substituted Service
Date: October 20, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: August 03, 2022Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: August 03, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: August 02, 2022Status Conference Sheet
Date: August 02, 2022Request for Civil Service
Date: August 02, 2022Original Petition - OCA
Date: August 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Deadline to Complete Matter Other CANCELED Deadline to Complete Matter (5:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Jeth) Other CLOSING DOCS DUE |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Nonsuit Proposed Order (unsigned) Order of Non-Suit Order of Non-Suit |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA Notice of Non-Suit Notice of Non-Suit |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Def Designation of Counsel Designation of Attorney of Record Def Designation of Counsel |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Jeth) 11/03/2022 Reset by Court to 01/05/2023 | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement - Marcon Notice of Filing Notice of Settlement; Sent to CRT Notice of Settlement; Sent to CRT |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Discovery Docket Control Order-Proposed Proposed Order (unsigned) Discovery Docket Control Order-Proposed |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
AMENDED CITATION RETURN RET Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena AMENDED CITATION RETURN AMENDED CITATION RETURN |
|
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Def Marcon Original Answer Original Answer Def Marcon Original Answer |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
CITATION RETURN-MAR-CON - CIT RET Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena CITATION RETURN CITATION RETURN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.