Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Centeramerica Capital Partnership Lp, Centro Np Holdings 12 Spe Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil - Suit To Set Appraisal/Review Of Assessment case represented by Gilbert D. Davila, against Galveston Central Appraisal District, represented by Nicholas Perez, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 01, 2022 |
CategoryOther Civil - Suit To Set Appraisal/Review Of Assessment |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
|
Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: August 25, 2023Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA
Date: September 13, 2023Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: April 24, 2023Motion for Continuance
Date: April 19, 2023Agreed Motion
Date: August 25, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 19, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 02, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: November 15, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: November 07, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 18, 2022Original Answer
Date: August 29, 2022Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: August 02, 2022Citation and Return
Date: August 09, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: August 01, 2022Status Conference Sheet
Date: August 01, 2022Original Petition - OCA
Date: August 01, 2022Request for Civil Service
Date: August 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes agreed final judgment agreed final judgment |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jared ) |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Check Status (5:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) awaiting final paperwork awaiting final paperwork |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Settled CANCELED Bench Trial (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) Settled |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment Final Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed Judgment Final Agreed Judgment Final |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
for Entry of Agreed Judgment Agreed Motion for Entry of Agreed Judgment for Entry of Agreed Judgment |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference Settled CANCELED Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) Settled |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Passed CANCELED Bench Trial (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) Passed |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Continuance (Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jared ) | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.