Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fawdington , Christopher, Fawdington , Julie, filed a(n) Other Civil - Suit To Set Appraisal/Review Of Assessment case represented by Clemetric R Frazier, against Galveston Central Appraisal District, represented by Nicholas Perez, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 01, 2022 |
CategoryOther Civil - Suit To Set Appraisal/Review Of Assessment |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
|
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA
Date: February 23, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 22, 2023Motion
Date: February 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Case Disposed CANCELED Bench Trial (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) Case Disposed |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) Case Disposed |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jared ) |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Final Judgment |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
P. Order -Agreed Judgment (1393) (Proposed) (Executed) Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed Judgment (Proposed) (1393) Agreed Judgment (Proposed) (1393) |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion (Joint) for Entry of Agreed Judgment (1393) Motion Motion (Joint) for Entry of Agreed Judgment (1393) |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order (Judicial Officer: Judge, Visiting ) discovery and d c o discovery and d c o |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
P. Order-Discovery and Docket Control Order Proposed Order (unsigned) Discovery and Docket Control Order Discovery and Docket Control Order |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes PTC 5-30-23 at 9am BTRL 7-5-23 @ 9:30am PTC 5-30-23 at 9am BTRL 7-5-23 @ 9:30am |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.