Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dorsett, W D, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Clemetric R Frazier, against Galveston Central Appraisal District, represented by Nicholas Perez, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Other Real Property - Ownership/Title |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA
Date: February 23, 2023Motion
Date: February 22, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Case Disposed CANCELED Bench Trial (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) Case Disposed |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) Case Disposed |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jared ) |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Final Judgment |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion (Joint) for Entry of Agreed Judgment (1386) Motion Motion (Joint) for Entry of Agreed Judgment (1386) |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
P. Order -Agreed Judgment (1386) (Proposed) (Executed) Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed Judgment (Proposed) (1386) Agreed Judgment (Proposed) (1386) |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order (Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jared ) discovery and d c o discovery and d c o |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY AND DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Proposed Order (unsigned) DISCOVERY AND DCO EXECUTED BY ALL COUNSEL DISCOVERY AND DCO EXECUTED BY ALL COUNSEL |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes PTC 3-20-23 @ 9AM BTRL 4-25-23 @ 9:30AM PTC 3-20-23 @ 9AM BTRL 4-25-23 @ 9:30AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.