Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Galveston County District Attorney, against Lilliman, Gale Dba Gulf Coast Bail Bonds, Turner, Amber Chantell, represented by Kevin Rekoff, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 18, 2022 |
CategoryCriminal Matters - Bond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Cost Bill - Work Product
Date: November 04, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 18, 2022Returned Mail Undeliverable
Date: August 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) Case Disposed |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Cost Bill - Work Product | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA Sent to BK & Civil DA 11/03/22 sbo Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Judge, Visiting ) Sent to BK & Civil DA 11/03/22 sbo |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes agreed final judgment agreed final judgment |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
P. Order - Agreed Final Judgment of Bond Forfeiture (Costs and Interest Only). Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed Final Judgment of Bond Forfeiture (Costs and Interest Only) Agreed Final Judgment of Bond Forfeiture (Costs and Interest Only) |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER - Surety Original Answer ANSWER - Surety |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable Returned by USPS / Marked Return to Sender/ Not Deliverable as Addressed/ Unable to Forward Returned by USPS / Marked Return to Sender/ Not Deliverable as Addressed/ Unable to Forward |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Copy of Notice mailed by first class mail mailed by first class mail |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge e-mail receipt from surety e-mail receipt from surety |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.