Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Texas City, College Of The Mainland, Galveston County, Texas City Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Wheeler, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Lonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: July 13, 2021Correspondence from Clerk of Court
Date: April 26, 2022Sheriff's Sale Distribution Sheet
Date: April 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Green Card Returned/Delivered | |
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence from Clerk of Court | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Sheriff's Sale Distribution Sheet | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Sale and Return | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale Issued - Service Copy 1 order of Sale issued @ $8.00. Sent to S/O 1 order of Sale issued @ $8.00. Sent to S/O |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request to Issue Order of Sale Tax Service Request 1 Order of Sale to be issued. Assigned to MM 1 Order of Sale to be issued. Assigned to MM |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
December 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment - Final - Non Jury - OCA (Judicial Officer: Cox, Lonnie ) | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Evidence (Judicial Officer: Cox, Lonnie ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.