Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Texas City, College Of The Mainland, Galveston County, Texas City Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Fleming, Geo, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 405th District Court with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House405th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: July 13, 2021Judgment - Final - Non Jury - OCA
Date: February 01, 2022Sheriff's Sale Distribution Sheet
Date: May 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Sheriff's Sale Distribution Sheet | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Sale and Return | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale Issued - Service Copy 1 order of Sale issued @ $8.00. Sent to S/O 1 order of Sale issued @ $8.00. Sent to S/O |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request to Issue Order of Sale Tax Service Request 1 Order of Sale to be issued. Assigned to MM 1 Order of Sale to be issued. Assigned to MM |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable Return To Sender Unable To Forward Return To Sender Unable To Forward |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment - Final - Non Jury - OCA (Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jared ) | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of Evidence (Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jared ) | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Tax - Signed by Tax Master Statement of Evidence Statement of Evidence |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.