Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of Texas City, College Of The Mainland, Galveston County, Texas City Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Johnson, G. W., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 405th District Court with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House405th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: July 12, 2021Tax Service Request
Date: April 18, 2022Order of Sale Issued - Service Copy
Date: April 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Sale and Return | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale Issued - Service Copy 1 Order of Sale issued @ $8.00. Sent to S/O 1 Order of Sale issued @ $8.00. Sent to S/O |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request to Issue Order of Sale Tax Service Request 1 Order of Sale to be issued. Assigned to MM 1 Order of Sale to be issued. Assigned to MM |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
March 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment - Final - Non Jury - OCA (Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jared ) | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of Evidence (Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jared ) | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment - Tax - Signed by Tax Master | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tax Master Report (Judicial Officer: McQuage, Thomas ) Final Final |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Tax - Signed by Tax Master Statement of Evidence Statement of Evidence |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.