Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Texas City, College Of The Mainland, Galveston County, Galveston County Drainage District # 02, Texas City Independent School District, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Connally, Glendora, represented by Laticia D Fuhr, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: June 23, 2021Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA
Date: June 24, 2022Tax Proposed Order
Date: August 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NONSUIT (FINAL OCA) Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA NOTICE OF NONSUIT- FINAL Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA NOTICE OF NONSUIT- FINAL |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Tax Proposed Order ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM Tax Motion MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge's Notes on Hearings and Trials Master's Recommendation: Appointment of Laticia Fuhr, attorney ad litem, per order filed. TWM Master's Recommendation: Appointment of Laticia Fuhr, attorney ad litem, per order filed. TWM |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation by Posting and Return | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation by Posting Issuance 1 citation by posting issued @ $8.00. Sent to S/O 1 citation by posting issued @ $8.00. Sent to S/O |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Service by Posting - Glendora Connally - Citation Tax Service Request 1 citation by posting to be issued. Assigned to MM 1 citation by posting to be issued. Assigned to MM |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Glendora Connally - Affidavit AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE - 21TX0360 GLENDORA CONNALLY Affidavit AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE - 21TX0360 GLENDORA CONNALLY |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - Tax Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.