Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of Texas City, College Of The Mainland, Galveston County, Texas City Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Beltz, Carl J., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: June 23, 2021Affidavit
Date: June 24, 2021Citation by Posting and Return
Date: July 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) 12/05/2022 Reset by Court to 11/13/2023 | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation by Posting and Return | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation by Posting Issuance 1 citation by posting issued @ $8.00. Sent to S/O 1 citation by posting issued @ $8.00. Sent to S/O |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Carl J Beltz - Affidavit AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE - 21TX0358 CARL J BELTZ Affidavit AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE - 21TX0358 CARL J BELTZ |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Service by Posting - Carl J Beltz - Citation Tax Service Request 1 citation by Posting to be issued. Assigned to MM 1 citation by Posting to be issued. Assigned to MM |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - Tax Original Petition |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - Tax Original Petition Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.