Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of La Marque, College Of The Mainland, Galveston County, Galveston County Drainage District # 02, Texas City Independent School District, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Ameriway Mortgage Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Lonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: June 09, 2021Sheriff's Sale Distribution Sheet
Date: March 08, 2022Tax Service Request
Date: December 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Sale Distribution Sheet Received From Bookkeeping 03/31/22 MM Received From Bookkeeping 03/31/22 MM |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Sale and Return | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale Issued - Service Copy 1 Order of Sale issued @ $8.00; sent to S/O 1 Order of Sale issued @ $8.00; sent to S/O |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
21-TX-0336 - Request to Issue Order of Sale Tax Service Request 1 Order of Sale to be issued; assigned to LS 1 Order of Sale to be issued; assigned to LS |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment - Final - Non Jury - OCA (Judicial Officer: Cox, Lonnie ) | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Evidence (Judicial Officer: Cox, Lonnie ) | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment - Tax - Signed by Tax Master | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order - Tax - Signed by Tax Master Statement of Evidence Statement of Evidence |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.