Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of Santa Fe, College Of The Mainland, Galveston County, Galveston County Drainage District # 01, Galveston County Emergency Services District # 01, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Snyder, Austin Harold, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Lonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: June 07, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: September 22, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: November 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) 12/06/2022 Reset by Court to 12/05/2023 | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Tax Notice Notice of Trial |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF SERVICE - AUSTIN HAROLD SNYDER Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena NOTICE OF CITATION - EXECUTED - AUSTIN HAROLD SNYDER NOTICE OF CITATION - EXECUTED - AUSTIN HAROLD SNYDER |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product 1 citation issued @ $8.00. Emailed to attorney 1 citation issued @ $8.00. Emailed to attorney |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge of e citation of e citation |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request to Reissue Citation Tax Service Request 1 citation to be issued. Assigned to MM 1 citation to be issued. Assigned to MM |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service - Unexecuted - AUSTIN HAROLD SNYDER Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena NOTICE OF CITATION - UNEXECUTED - 21-TX-0332 - AUSTIN HAROLD SNYDER NOTICE OF CITATION - UNEXECUTED - 21-TX-0332 - AUSTIN HAROLD SNYDER |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer-SFISD Original Answer Original Answer |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Service - Austin Harold Snyder Tax Service Request 1 Citation to be issued. Assigned to MM 1 Citation to be issued. Assigned to MM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.