Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
College Of The Mainland, Galveston County, San Leon Municipal Utility District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Hagermann, Elizabeth Ann, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 405th District Court with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 14, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House405th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: May 14, 2021Tax Service Request
Date: August 02, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: August 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) 12/12/2022 Reset by Court to 11/17/2023 | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Emailed 1 Citation to Atty. Emailed 1 Citation to Atty. |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF CITATION- ELIZABETH HAGERMANN (RI) Tax Service Request 1 Citation to be Issued; Assigned to S.D. 1 Citation to be Issued; Assigned to S.D. |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product Issued 1 Citation @ 12.00; Emailed to Atty. Issued 1 Citation @ 12.00; Emailed to Atty. |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return of Service - Unexecuted-HAGERMANN Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena Return of Service - Unexecuted Return of Service - Unexecuted |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request For Service - Elizabeth Ann Hagermann (RI) Tax Service Request 1 citation to be issued. Assigned to MM 1 citation to be issued. Assigned to MM |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product 1 citation issued @ $8.00. Emailed to attorney 1 citation issued @ $8.00. Emailed to attorney |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge of e citation of e citation |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Unexecuted | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Alternative Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.