Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of Friendswood, Friendswood Independent School District, Galveston County Consolidated Drainage District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Humphrey, Yolanda M., Yolanda M. Humphrey, against Poage, Samuel, United States Of America - Internal Revenue Service, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: May 07, 2021Order of Sale Issued - Service Copy
Date: January 19, 2023Order of Sale Returned - Recalled
Date: March 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale Returned - Recalled (Cancelled per Attorney 03/06/23) (Cancelled per Attorney 03/06/23) |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale Issued - Service Copy 1 Order of sale issued @ $8.00. Sent to S/O 1 Order of sale issued @ $8.00. Sent to S/O |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
21TX0274 OOS Request 3.7.23 Tax Service Request 1 Order of sale to be issued. Assigned to MM 1 Order of sale to be issued. Assigned to MM |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment - Final - Default - OCA (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Address | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Non Military | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tax Master Report (Judicial Officer: McQuage, Thomas ) Default Default |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment - Tax - Signed by Tax Master |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.