Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Galveston, Galveston College, Galveston County, Galveston County Navigation District # 01, Galveston Independent School District, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Battistoni, Brian Thomas, Battistoni, Jerri, Brennan, Jennifer Battistoni, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 122nd District Court with Ellisor, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEllisor, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House122nd District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: March 18, 2021Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA
Date: June 17, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: June 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit (Final OCA) Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA NOTICE OF NONSUIT - Final Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA NOTICE OF NONSUIT - Final |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service - Executed - JENNIFER BATTISTONI BRENNAN Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena NOTICE OF CITATION - EXECUTED - 21-TX-0164 - JENNIFER BATTISTONI BRENNAN NOTICE OF CITATION - EXECUTED - 21-TX-0164 - JENNIFER BATTISTONI BRENNAN |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service - Executed - JERRI BATTISTONI Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena NOTICE OF CITATION - EXECUTED - 21-TX-0164 - JERRI BATTISTONI NOTICE OF CITATION - EXECUTED - 21-TX-0164 - JERRI BATTISTONI |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service - Executed - BRIAN THOMAS BATTISTONI Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena NOTICE OF CITATION - EXECUTED - 21-TX-0164 - BRIAN THOMAS BATTISTONI NOTICE OF CITATION - EXECUTED - 21-TX-0164 - BRIAN THOMAS BATTISTONI |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge of e citation of e citation |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product 3 citations issued @ $24.00. Emailed to attorney 3 citations issued @ $24.00. Emailed to attorney |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request to Issue Citation Tax Service Request 3 citations to be issued. Assigned to MM 3 citations to be issued. Assigned to MM |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - Tax Original Petition |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - Tax Original Petition Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.